There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

WILD Act
Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

WILD Act
Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act

Short Titles as Introduced

WILD Act
Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Partners for Fish and Wildlife Program and certain wildlife conservation funds, to establish prize competitions relating to the prevention of wildlife poaching and trafficking, wildlife conservation, the management of invasive species, and the protection of endangered species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/08/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3375-3380; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S3375-3380)
05/17/2017Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-73.
04/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/01/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/09/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/08/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/08/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/08/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/08/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/12/2017-8:37pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/12/2017-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/09/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/08/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3375-3380; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S3375-3380)
05/17/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 91.
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-73.
04/05/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/04/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2217)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/04/2017

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works04/04/2017 Referred to
04/05/2017 Markup by
05/17/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-73
House Natural Resources08/08/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands09/07/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans09/07/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture08/08/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry09/01/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure08/08/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment08/09/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology08/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.826. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/08/2017)

Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act or the WILD Act

This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 several programs that provide funding for wildlife conservation and sets forth requirements for invasive species management.

TITLE I--PARTNERS FOR FISH AND WILDLIFE PROGRAM REAUTHORIZATION

(Sec. 1001) This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 the Partners for Fish and Wildlife Program.

TITLE II--FISH AND WILDLIFE COORDINATION

(Sec. 2002) This bill amends the Fish and Wildlife Coordination Act to direct federal agencies that have duties relating to invasive species management for the protection of water and wildlife to: (1) inhibit or reduce the populations of invasive species and effectuate restoration or reclamation efforts on land the agencies manage, and (2) develop a strategic plan for implementing an invasive species program designed to achieve a substantive annual net reduction of invasive species populations or infested acreage in managed areas. Under a strategic plan, agencies must prioritize the use of methods that control and manage invasive species in the least costly manner, are based on sound science, and minimize environmental impacts. Further, agencies must expedite projects and activities that are in areas at high risk for invasive species and require immediate action to address the risk.

The bill sets forth: (1) requirements for how agencies may use funds made available for invasive species management, and (2) reporting requirements.

TITLE III--WILDLIFE CONSERVATION

(Sec. 3001) This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 the African Elephant Conservation Act, the Asian Elephant Conservation Act of 1997, the Rhinoceros and Tiger Conservation Act of 1994, the Great Ape Conservation Fund, and the Marine Turtle Conservation Fund.

This bill amends the Great Ape Conservation Act of 2000, including to authorize the Department of the Interior to award a multi-year grant for carrying out a project that is an effective, long-term conservation strategy for great apes (defined in the Act as chimpanzees, gorillas, bonobos, orangutans, and gibbons) and their habitats.

This bill amends the Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004 to make a wildlife management authority of a U.S. territory eligible for financial assistance for marine turtle conservation.

TITLE IV--PRIZE COMPETITIONS

(Sec. 4002) The U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service must establish Theodore Roosevelt Genius Prizes for: (1) prevention of wildlife poaching and trafficking, (2) promotion of wildlife conservation, (3) management of invasive species, (4) protection of endangered species, and (5) nonlethal management of human-wildlife conflicts. The bill establishes advisory boards for those prizes.