There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

AFG and SAFER Program Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

AFG and SAFER Program Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

AFG and SAFER Program Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Assistance to Firefighters Grants program, the Fire Prevention and Safety Grants program, and the Staffing for Adequate Fire and Emergency Response grant program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/02/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4714-4715; text: CR S4714-4715)
07/11/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-128.
04/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
08/04/2017-1:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4714-4715; text: CR S4714-4715)
07/11/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168.
07/11/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-128.
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/05/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/05/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
07/11/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-128
House Science, Space, and Technology08/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.829. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/02/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on July 11, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

AFG and SAFER Program Reauthorization Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the the Federal Fire Prevention and Control Act of 1974 to: (1) repeal the expiration dates of, and to reauthorize through FY2023, the Assistance to Firefighters Grants (AFG) Program, the Fire Prevention and Safety Grants (FPSG) Program, and the Staffing for Adequate Fire and Emergency Response Grant (SAFER) Program; and (2) authorize the use of AFG Program grants, instead of SAFER Program grants, to provide specialized training to first responders on how to recognize and properly intervene with individuals with mental illness.

(Sec. 3) The SAFER Program is revised to permit the use of grants to change the status of part-time or paid-on-call firefighters to full-time firefighters.

(Sec. 4) The United States Fire Administration (USFA) may develop and make widely available an electronic, online training course for members of the fire and emergency response community on matters related to the administration of AFG, FPSG, and SAFER grants.

The Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) shall ensure that any such training is: (1) tailored to the financial and time constraints of members of the fire and emergency response community; and (2) accessible to all individuals in the career, combination, paid-on-call, and volunteer fire and emergency response community.

(Sec. 5) The USFA shall develop and implement a grant monitoring and oversight framework to mitigate and minimize risks of fraud, waste, abuse, and mismanagement relating to such grants programs.