There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 West Pike Street in Canonsburg, Pennsylvania, as the "Police Officer Scott Bashioum Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/16/2018Became Public Law No: 115-137. (TXT | PDF)
03/16/2018Signed by President.
03/08/2018Presented to President.
03/05/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1352)
06/13/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3459; text: CR S3459)
05/17/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
04/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/16/2018Became Public Law No: 115-137. (TXT | PDF)
03/16/2018Signed by President.
03/08/2018SenatePresented to President.
03/05/2018-5:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2018-5:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1352)
03/05/2018-5:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 831.
03/05/2018-5:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1351-1352)
03/05/2018-5:36pmHouseMr. Palmer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/14/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/14/2017-12:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/14/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/13/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3459; text: CR S3459)
05/17/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 92.
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/05/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/05/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/05/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
05/17/2017 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform06/14/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.831.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.831. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-137 (03/16/2018)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 West Pike Street in Canonsburg, Pennsylvania, as the "Police Officer Scott Bashioum Post Office Building."