There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Blocking Regulatory Interference from Closing Kilns Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to allow for judicial review of any final rule addressing national emission standards for hazardous air pollutants for brick and structural clay products or for clay ceramics manufacturing before requiring compliance with such rule.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
11/14/2017Committee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-127.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety
04/05/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 04/05/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/05/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/12/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/15/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 06/29/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 07/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works04/05/2017 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety11/14/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.839. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/05/2017)

Blocking Regulatory Interference from Closing Kilns Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the Environmental Protection Agency from requiring compliance with Clean Air Act rules concerning national emission standards for hazardous air pollutants with respect to brick and structural clay products manufacturing or clay ceramics manufacturing until judicial reviews of the rules are complete.