There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SMASH Act
Strengthening Mosquito Abatement for Safety and Health Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

SMASH Act
Strengthening Mosquito Abatement for Safety and Health Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SMASH Act
Strengthening Mosquito Abatement for Safety and Health Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to support programs for mosquito-borne and other vector-borne disease surveillance and control.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/06/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5018-5019; text: S5018-5019)
05/01/2017Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
09/08/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/07/2017-12:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/07/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/06/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5018-5019; text: S5018-5019)
05/01/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 45.
05/01/2017SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
04/26/2017SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
04/05/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/05/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/05/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/05/2017
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/27/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/27/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/01/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/05/2017 Referred to
04/26/2017 Markup by
05/01/2017 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce09/07/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.849. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/06/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on May 1, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Strengthening Mosquito Abatement for Safety and Health Act or the SMASH Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise and extend through FY2022 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) grants for mosquito control programs. The grant program is expanded so that grants may be used to address emerging, infectious mosquito-borne diseases and to improve existing control programs. The CDC must give preference to applicants that have: (1) a public health emergency due to a mosquito-borne disease, or (2) a control program that is consistent with existing state preparedness plans. The requirement for matching funds may be waived if the area covered by a grant applicant has an extreme need due to the size or density of the potentially impacted human population, the size or density of the mosquito population that requires heightened control, or the severity of the mosquito-borne disease.

(Sec. 3) CDC grants to help public health agencies improve surveillance and response activities are extended through FY2022.

(Sec. 4) The Government Accountability Office must report on the surveillance and control of mosquito-borne infectious diseases in the United States and territories.