There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the entitlement to educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program of the Department of Veterans Affairs for members of the Armed Forces awarded the Purple Heart, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
06/15/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/06/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 04/06/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/06/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 04/06/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/24/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/05/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/06/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.882. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/06/2017)

This bill entitles members of the Armed Forces who have been awarded the Purple Heart for service occurring on or after September 11, 2001, to educational assistance under the Department of Veterans Affairs' Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program.

Such individuals are also eligible to participate in the Yellow Ribbon G.I. Education Enhancement Program.