There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish an Acquisition Review Board in the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/09/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/16/2017 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-170.
04/06/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
11/13/2017-6:30pm House Held at the desk.
11/13/2017-2:04pm House Received in the House.
11/13/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
11/09/2017 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/2017 Senate S.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/2017 Senate S.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Daines. (consideration: CR S7164) In the nature of a substitute.
11/09/2017 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7164)
10/16/2017 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 240.
10/16/2017 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-170.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/26/2017 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
04/06/2017 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2427-2428)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 04/06/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/06/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
10/16/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-170

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Advisory bodies
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Homeland Security
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Public contracts and procurement

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.886. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/09/2017)

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish an Acquisition Review Board to strengthen accountability and uniformity within the DHS acquisition review process, review major acquisition programs (programs estimated to require a total expenditure of at least $300 million over their life cycle costs), and review the use of best practices.

The board shall convene at DHS's discretion and whenever: (1) a major acquisition program requires authorization to proceed from one acquisition decision event to another, is in breach of its approved requirements, or requires additional review; or (2) a non-major acquisition program requires review.

The board's responsibilities are to:

  • determine whether a proposed acquisition program has met the requirements of phases of the acquisition life cycle framework and is able to proceed to the next phase and eventual full production and deployment;
  • oversee whether a proposed acquisition's business strategy, resources, management, and accountability is executable and aligned to strategic initiatives;
  • support the acquisition decision authority in determining the appropriate direction at key acquisition decision events;
  • conduct reviews to ensure that acquisitions are progressing in compliance with the approved documents for their current acquisition phases;
  • review the acquisition documents of each major acquisition program to ensure the reliability of underlying data; and
  • ensure that practices are implemented to require consideration of tradeoffs among cost, schedule, and performance objectives as part of the process for developing requirements for major acquisition programs prior to initiating the second acquisition decision event.

If the person exercising acquisition decision authority over a major acquisition program approves such program to proceed into the planning phase before such program has a DHS-approved acquisition program baseline, as required by DHS policy, DHS shall create and approve a baseline report regarding such approval and notify Congress.

DHS, by one year after this bill's enactment and annually through FY2022, shall provide information to Congress on the board's activities.