There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans Providing Healthcare Transition Improvement Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Providing Healthcare Transition Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 5, United States Code, to ensure that the requirements that new Federal employees who are veterans with service-connected disabilities are provided leave for purposes of undergoing medical treatment for such disabilities apply to certain employees of the Veterans Health Administration

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to amend title 5, United States Code, to ensure that the requirements that new Federal employees who are veterans with service-connected disabilities are provided leave for purposes of undergoing medical treatment for such disabilities apply to certain employees of the Veterans Health Administration.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure that the requirements that new Federal employees who are veterans with service-connected disabilities are provided leave for purposes of undergoing medical treatment for such disabilities apply to certain employees of the Veterans Health Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
09/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-238. (TXT | PDF)
09/07/2018Signed by President.
08/28/2018Presented to President.
08/22/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5869)
07/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6213-6214)
03/20/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1848)
03/20/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1848)
04/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-238. (TXT | PDF)
09/07/2018Signed by President.
08/28/2018SenatePresented to President.
08/23/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/22/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5869)
07/17/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
07/16/2018-4:50pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/16/2018-4:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/16/2018-4:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6213-6214)
07/16/2018-4:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 899.
07/16/2018-4:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6213-6215)
07/16/2018-4:40pmHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/21/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/21/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/21/2018-11:20amHouseReceived in the House.
03/21/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/21/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/20/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1848)
03/20/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1848)
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299.
04/07/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 04/07/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/07/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/12/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/07/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Hearings by
03/20/2018 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs03/21/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity03/21/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform03/21/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.899. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-238 (09/07/2018)

Veterans Providing Healthcare Transition Improvement Act

This bill amends the Wounded Warriors Federal Leave Act of 2015 to extend the policy entitling new federal employees who are veterans with a service-connected disability rated at 30% or more to a specified amount of leave for medical treatment for such disability to Veterans Health Administration physicians, dentists, podiatrists, chiropractors, optometrists, registered nurses, physician assistants, and expanded-function dental auxiliaries.