There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Reducing DHS Acquisition Cost Growth Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Reducing DHS Acquisition Cost Growth Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Reducing DHS Acquisition Cost Growth Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide for congressional notification regarding major acquisition program breaches, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/09/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 115-165.
04/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/13/2017-6:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/13/2017-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/13/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/09/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/2017SenateS.Amdt.1583 Amendment SA 1583 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/2017SenateS.Amdt.1583 Amendment SA 1583 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator McCaskill. (consideration: CR S7164-7166) In the nature of a substitute.
11/09/2017SenateThe committee amendment withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7166)
11/09/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7164-7166; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7164-7166)
10/05/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 234.
10/05/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 115-165.
07/26/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/07/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 04/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/07/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
10/05/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-165
House Homeland Security02/22/2018 Legislative interest
02/23/2018 Legislative interest

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.906. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/09/2017)

Reducing DHS Acquisition Cost Growth Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the program manager of a major acquisition program (a Department of Homeland Security [DHS] acquisition program estimated to require an eventual total expenditure of at least $300 million over its life cycle cost) to notify the program's Component Acquisition Executive (CAE) (the senior acquisition official within a DHS component designated to lead a process and staff to provide acquisition and program management oversight, policy, and guidance to ensure that statutory, regulatory, and higher level policy requirements are fulfilled), the head of the component concerned, the Executive Director of the Program Accountability and Risk Management division, the Under Secretary for Management, and the Deputy Secretary of DHS within 30 days after any breach in such program is identified.

If such a breach results in a cost overrun greater than 15%, a schedule delay greater than 180 days, or a failure to meet any performance thresholds from the cost, schedule, or performance parameters specified in the most recently approved acquisition program baseline for such a program, the CAE must notify the DHS Secretary and Inspector General within five business days after such other officials are notified of the breach.

If such a breach occurs, the program manager for such program shall submit to the component head, the Executive Director, and the Under Secretary in writing a remediation plan and root cause analysis. The Under Secretary shall review each remediation plan and may approve it or provide an alternative proposed corrective action.

The Under Secretary shall notify the congressional homeland security committees of such breach. If a likely cost overrun is greater than 20% or a likely delay is greater than 12 months from the costs and schedule specified in the baseline, the Under Secretary shall include in such notification a written certification that:

  • such program is essential to the accomplishment of DHS's mission;
  • there are no alternatives to the capability or asset provided by such program that will provide equal or greater capability in both a more cost-effective and timely manner;
  • the new acquisition schedule and estimates for total acquisition cost are reasonable; and
  • the management structure for such program is adequate to manage and control cost, schedule, and performance.

(Sec. 3) The Inspector General to study and report on the prevalence and impact of bid protests on the DHS acquisition process, particularly protests filed with the Government Accountability Office and the U.S. Court of Federal Claims.