There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ensuring Patient Access to Substance Use Disorder Treatments Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for the delivery of a controlled substance by a pharmacy to an administering practitioner.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act with regard to the provision of emergency medical services.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/23/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2882-2884)
05/01/2017Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/24/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
05/25/2018-10:32amHouseHeld at the desk.
05/25/2018-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
05/24/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/23/2018SenateS.Amdt.2268 Amendment SA 2268 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2018SenateS.Amdt.2268 Amendment SA 2268 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cassidy. (consideration: CR S2884) To amend the title.
05/23/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2882-2884)
05/23/2018SenateS.Amdt.2267 Amendment SA 2267 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2018SenateS.Amdt.2267 Amendment SA 2267 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cassidy. (consideration: CR S2884; text: CR S2884) In the nature of a substitute.
05/23/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2882-2884)
05/01/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 46.
05/01/2017SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
04/26/2017SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
04/24/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/24/2017 Referred to
04/26/2017 Markup by
05/01/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.916. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (05/01/2017)

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to direct the Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA) to register an emergency medical services (EMS) agency to administer controlled substances if the agency submits an application demonstrating that it is authorized to conduct such activity in the state in which the agency practices. The DEA may deny an application if it determines that the registration is inconsistent with the public interest.

An EMS agency may obtain a single registration in each state instead of a separate registration for each location.

A registered EMS agency may deliver, store, and receive controlled substances, subject to specified conditions.

An EMS professional of a registered EMS agency may administer controlled substances in schedules II, III, IV, or V outside the physical presence of a medical director if such administration is authorized under state law and pursuant to a standing or verbal order, subject to specified conditions.

The bill specifies that a hospital-based EMS agency (i.e., an EMS agency owned or operated by a hospital) may continue to administer controlled substances under the hospital's DEA registration.

(Sec. 3) A pharmacy may deliver a controlled substance to an administering practitioner in accordance with this bill's requirements, subject to specified conditions.

The Government Accountability Office must report to Congress on access to and the potential diversion of controlled substances administered by injection, implantation, or through the use of an intrathecal pump.