There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Yellowstone Gateway Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Yellowstone Gateway Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to withdraw certain National Forest System land in the Emigrant Crevice area located in the Custer Gallatin National Forest, Park County, Montana, from the mining and mineral leasing laws of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/04/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-402.
11/29/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
04/25/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
12/04/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-402.
Action By: Senate
11/29/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 688.
Action By: Senate
11/29/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
10/02/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/26/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-482.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
04/25/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 12/18/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/25/2017 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-402
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining07/26/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.941. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/25/2017)

Yellowstone Gateway Protection Act

This bill withdraws specified National Forest System land in the Custer Gallatin National Forest in Park County, Montana, identified on the map titled "Emigrant Crevice Proposed Withdrawal Area," dated November 10, 2016, from: (1) location, entry, and patent under mining laws; and (2) disposition under all laws pertaining to mineral and geothermal leasing.

Any land within the withdrawal area that is acquired by the federal government after enactment of this bill must be immediately withdrawn in accordance with this bill.