There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Communications Act of 1934 to ensure the integrity of voice communications and to prevent unjust or unreasonable discrimination among areas of the United States in the delivery of such communications.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
02/26/2018Became Public Law No: 115-129. (TXT | PDF)
02/26/2018Signed by President.
02/14/2018Presented to President.
02/09/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H990-991)
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4815-4816; text: CR S4815-4816)
03/21/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-6.
01/11/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
02/26/2018Became Public Law No: 115-129. (TXT | PDF)
02/26/2018Signed by President.
02/14/2018SenatePresented to President.
02/09/2018-4:40amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/09/2018-4:40amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H990-991)
02/09/2018-4:40amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR 2/8/2018 H1002)
02/08/2018-12:29pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lance objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
02/08/2018-12:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 96.
02/08/2018-12:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H990-992)
02/08/2018-12:17pmHouseMr. Lance moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/04/2017-2:32pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/04/2017-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4815-4816; text: CR S4815-4816)
03/21/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 19.
03/21/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-6.
01/24/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/11/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/11/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/11/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/01/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/15/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 02/15/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/28/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 03/07/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/30/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/11/2017 Referred to
01/24/2017 Markup by
03/21/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-6

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.96. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-129 (02/26/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 21, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to require intermediate providers that offer the capability to transmit voice communications and signaling information from one destination to another, and that charge a rate to any other entity (including an affiliated entity) for such a transmission, to: (1) register with the Federal Communications Commission (FCC), and (2) comply with service quality standards to be established by the FCC.

An "intermediate provider" is an entity that: (1) enters a business arrangement with a long-distance voice service provider that makes the initial call path choice for more than 100,000 domestic retail subscriber lines, or with another intermediate provider, to carry, route, or transmit voice traffic from a call placed from or to an end user connection using a North American Numbering Plan resource; and (2) does not itself (directly or in conjunction with an affiliate) serve as such a long-distance initial call path choice provider in the context of originating or terminating a given call.

The bill prohibits such long-distance providers (including local exchange carriers, interexchange carriers, commercial mobile radio services, interconnected voice over Internet Protocol [VoIP] services, and certain non-interconnected VoIP services) from using an intermediate provider to transmit voice communications and signals unless the intermediate provider is so registered.

The FCC must: (1) ensure the integrity of the transmission of voice communications to all customers in the United States, (2) prevent unjust or unreasonable discrimination among areas of the United States in the delivery of such voice communications, and (3) make a registry of intermediate providers publicly available on the FCC website.

The bill shall not be construed to preempt or expand the authority of a state agency or public utility commission to collect data, or enforce state law and regulations, regarding the completion of intrastate voice communications.

Certain long-distance providers that make initial call path choices are exempt from service quality standards that the FCC is required to establish under this bill if they certify under a safe harbor provision in existing FCC rules that they monitor the performance of, or do not use, intermediate providers.