There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Restoring Internet Freedom Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the Federal Communications Commission from reclassifying broadband Internet access service as a telecommunications service and from imposing certain regulations on providers of such service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/01/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (11)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/04/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/04/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/01/2017 Referred to

As of 08/17/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.993 - Restoring Internet Freedom Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.993. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/01/2017)

Restoring Internet Freedom Act

This bill nullifies the rule adopted by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) on February 26, 2015, relating to the reclassification of broadband Internet access service as a telecommunications service.

The FCC is prohibited from reissuing such rule in substantially the same form, or from issuing a new rule that is substantially the same, unless the rule is specifically authorized by a law enacted after enactment of this bill.