There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Tariff Act of 1930 to protect personally identifiable information, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/01/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/01/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2651-2652)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 05/01/2017
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 10/24/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 08/23/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 09/06/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/04/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/04/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/11/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/29/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance05/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.998. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/01/2017)

Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act

This bill amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to revise requirements regarding the public disclosure of personally identifiable information contained in the manifest of vessels or aircraft entering any U.S. port or place to direct the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to ensure that any such information, including social security numbers, passport numbers, and residential addresses, are removed from any manifest signed and transmitted to the CBP before it is disclosed to the public.