There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2017, as "Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
07/27/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. Without written report.
05/18/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
08/04/2017-2:31pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/04/2017-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
07/27/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
07/27/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. Without written report.
07/26/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/18/2017SenateReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3047)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 05/18/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/19/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/20/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/18/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
07/27/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.15. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/03/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on July 27, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Supports the designation of October 28, 2017, as Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day.