There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for the unveiling of the American Prisoners of War/Missing in Action (POW/MIA) Chair of Honor.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H8168)
10/16/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6409; text: CR S6406)
10/16/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
10/25/2017-2:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/25/2017-2:12pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8168)
10/25/2017-2:12pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8168)
10/25/2017-2:12pmHouseMr. Harper asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
10/19/2017-1:21pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/19/2017-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/17/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/16/2017SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6409; text: CR S6406)

Committees (0)

As of 06/19/2019 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.26 - A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for the unveiling of the American Prisoners of War/Missing in Action (POW/MIA) Chair of Honor.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.26. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/25/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for the unveiling of the American Prisoners of War/Missing in Action (POW/MIA) Chair of Honor.