There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.J.Res.34. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-22 (04/03/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission entitled "Protecting the Privacy of Customers of Broadband and Other Telecommunications Services." The rule published on December 2, 2016: (1) applies the customer privacy requirements of the Communications Act of 1934 to broadband Internet access service and other telecommunications services, (2) requires telecommunications carriers to inform customers about rights to opt in or opt out of the use or the sharing of their confidential information, (3) adopts data security and breach notification requirements, (4) prohibits broadband service offerings that are contingent on surrendering privacy rights, and (5) requires disclosures and affirmative consent when a broadband provider offers customers financial incentives in exchange for the provider's right to use a customer's confidential information.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
04/03/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-22.
04/03/2017 Signed by President.
04/03/2017 Signed by President.
03/30/2017 Presented to President.
03/28/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 205 (Roll no. 202).(text: CR H2489)
03/23/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 48. Record Vote Number: 94.(text: CR S1955)
03/15/2017 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
03/07/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
04/03/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-22.
04/03/2017 Signed by President.
04/03/2017 Signed by President.
03/30/2017 Senate Presented to President.
03/28/2017-5:57pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/28/2017-5:57pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 205 (Roll no. 202). (text: CR H2489)
03/28/2017-5:49pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2503-2504)
03/28/2017-5:09pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J.Res. 34, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Doyle demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
03/28/2017-5:09pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/28/2017-3:49pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 34.
03/28/2017-3:49pm House Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 34 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
03/28/2017-3:49pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 230. (consideration: CR H2489-2501)
03/28/2017-3:48pm House Rule H. Res. 230 passed House.
03/27/2017-6:40pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 230 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 34 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
03/23/2017-8:14pm House Held at the desk.
03/23/2017-8:05pm House Received in the House.
03/23/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
03/23/2017 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 48. Record Vote Number: 94. (text: CR S1955)
03/23/2017 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1942-1955)
03/22/2017 Senate Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1925-1929, S1935-1940)
03/22/2017 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1925)
03/15/2017 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
03/15/2017 Senate Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
03/07/2017 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Titles (1)

Official Titles:

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced:

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Protecting the Privacy of Customers of Broadband and Other Telecommunications Services".


Subjects (9)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Congressional oversight
  • Consumer affairs
  • Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
  • Internet and video services
  • Marketing and advertising
  • Right of privacy
  • Telephone and wireless communication

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/07/2017 Referred to
03/15/2017 Discharged from

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.