There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution condemning the violence and domestic terrorist attack that took place during events between August 11 and August 12, 2017, in Charlottesville, Virginia, recognizing the first responders who lost their lives while monitoring the events, offering deepest condolences to the families and friends of those individuals who were killed and deepest sympathies and support to those individuals who were injured by the violence, expressing support for the Charlottesville community, rejecting White nationalists, White supremacists, the Ku Klux Klan, neo-Nazis, and other hate groups, and urging the President and the President's Cabinet to use all available resources to address the threats posed by those groups.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
09/14/2017Became Public Law No: 115-58. (TXT | PDF)
09/14/2017Signed by President.
09/14/2017Presented to President.
09/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H7288)
09/11/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5165; text: CR S5165)
09/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
09/14/2017Became Public Law No: 115-58. (TXT | PDF)
09/14/2017Signed by President.
09/14/2017SenatePresented to President.
09/12/2017-6:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2017-6:55pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7288)
09/12/2017-6:54pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7287-7288)
09/12/2017-6:54pmHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
09/12/2017-5:20pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/12/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/12/2017-5:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5165; text: CR S5165)
09/07/2017SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 212.
09/06/2017SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5006)

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 09/06/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 09/06/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/06/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 09/06/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 09/06/2017
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/07/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/07/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/07/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/07/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/07/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/07/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/07/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/07/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 09/07/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/07/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/07/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 09/07/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 09/07/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/07/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/07/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/07/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/07/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/07/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 09/07/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/07/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/07/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 09/07/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/07/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/07/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/07/2017
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/07/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/07/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 09/07/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/07/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/07/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/07/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/07/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/07/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/07/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/07/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/07/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/07/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/07/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/07/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/07/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 09/07/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/07/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/07/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/07/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/07/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/07/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/07/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 09/07/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/07/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/11/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 09/11/2017

Committees (0)

As of 12/10/2018 text has not been received for S.J.Res.49 - A joint resolution condemning the violence and domestic terrorist attack that took place during events between August 11 and August 12, 2017, in Charlottesville, Virginia, recognizing the first responders who lost their lives while monitoring the events, offering deepest condolences to the families and friends of those individuals who were killed and deepest sympathies and support to those individuals who were injured by the violence, expressing support for the Charlottesville community, rejecting White nationalists, White supremacists, the Ku Klux Klan, neo-Nazis, and other hate groups, and urging the President and the President's Cabinet to use all available resources to address the threats posed by those groups.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.J.Res.49. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-58 (09/14/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution condemns the racist violence and domestic terror attack in Charlottesville, Virginia, and rejects white nationalism, white supremacy, and neo-Nazism sentiments as antithetical to U.S. values. 

Congress offers condolences to the families of those who died in Charlottesville and sympathy and support for those injured, and expresses support to the Charlottesville community.

Congress urges the President and the Administration to speak out against hate groups and use all available resources to address the growing prevalence of domestic hate groups.