There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Restoring Internet Freedom".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/16/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 97.(text: CR S2709)
05/09/2018Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
02/27/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/16/2018-5:38pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2018-5:15pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/16/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 97. (text: CR S2709)
05/16/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S2698-2709)
05/16/2018SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 96.
05/16/2018SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S2698)
05/15/2018SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-322.
05/09/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 406.
05/09/2018SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
02/27/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/27/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/27/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 02/27/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/27/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Discharged from
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship05/15/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.52. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (05/16/2018)

This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission entitled "Restoring Internet Freedom." The rule published on February 22, 2018: (1) restores the classification of broadband Internet access service as a lightly-regulated "information service"; (2) reinstates private mobile service classification of mobile broadband Internet access service; (3) requires Internet service providers to disclose information about their network management practices, performance characteristics, and commercial terms of service; and (4) eliminates the Internet Conduct Standard and the bright-line rules.