There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/13/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 266.(text: CR S7565)
11/28/2018Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Yea-Nay Vote. 63 - 37. Record Vote Number: 250, pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1546a.
02/28/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2018-4:42pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2018-2:11pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/17/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 266. (text: CR S7565)
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4098 Amendment SA 4098 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 265.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4097 Amendment SA 4097 not agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4098 Amendment SA 4098 proposed by Senator Cotton. (consideration: CR S7563-7654 text: CR S7654) To clarify that the requirement to remove United States Armed Forces does not apply to forces engaged in operations to support efforts to disrupt Houthi attacks against locations outside of Yemen, such as ballistic missile attacks, unmanned aerial vehicle attacks, maritime attacks against United States or international vessels, or terrorist attacks against civilian targets.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4097 Amendment SA 4097 proposed by Senator Cotton. (consideration: CR S7563-7654 text: CR S7564) To clarify that the requirement to remove United States Armed Forces does not apply to the provision of materials and advice intended to reduce civilian casualties or further enable adherence to the Law of Armed Conflict.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4095 Amendment SA 4095 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4090 Amendment SA 4090 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4095 Amendment SA 4095 proposed by Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S7563; text: CR S7563) To require a report assessing the increased risk of terrorist attacks in the United States if the Government of Saudi Arabia were to cease Yemen-related intelligence sharing with the United States.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4090 Amendment SA 4090 proposed by Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S7556; text: CR S7556) To require a report assessing risks posed by ceasing support operations with respect to the conflict between the Saudi-led coalition and the Houthis in Yemen.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4096 Amendment SA 4096 as modified agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 99 - 0. Record Vote Number: 264.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4080 Amendment SA 4080 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 58 - 41. Record Vote Number: 263.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4096 Amendment SA 4096 proposed by Senator Corker for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S7556; text as modified: CR S7556) To provide that nothing in the joint resolution shall be construed to influence or disrupt any military operations and cooperation with Israel.
12/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.4080 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S7534,7562,7563)
12/13/2018SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S7534-7565)
12/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4080 Amendment SA 4080 proposed by Senator Young. (consideration: CR S7488-7503; text: CR S7488) To clarify that this resolution prohibits United States Armed Forces from refueling non-United States aircraft conducting missions as part of the ongoing civil war in Yemen.
12/12/2018SenateBy a decision of the Senate the point of order that amendments offered under 50 U.S.C. 1546a be germane to the underlying joint resolution to which they are offered was well taken by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 3. Record Vote Number: 262.
12/12/2018SenatePoint of order that amendments offered under 50 U.S.C. 1546a be germane to the underlying joint resolution to which they are offered raised in Senate.
12/12/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S7482-7503)
12/12/2018SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 261.
11/28/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 682.
11/28/2018SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Yea-Nay Vote. 63 - 37. Record Vote Number: 250, pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1546a.
11/28/2018SenateMotion to discharge Senate Committee on Foreign Relations made pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1546a. (consideration: CR S7155-7165)
03/20/2018SenateMotion to table the motion to discharge Committee on Foreign Relations agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 44. Record Vote Number: 58. (consideration: CR S1827)
03/20/2018SenateMotion to discharge Senate Committee on Foreign Relations made. (consideration: CR S1801-1827)
02/28/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations02/28/2018 Referred to
11/28/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.54. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/13/2018)

This joint resolution directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities in or affecting Yemen within 30 days unless Congress authorizes a later withdrawal date, issues a declaration of war, or specifically authorizes the use of the Armed Forces. Prohibited activites include providing in-flight fueling for non-U.S. aircraft conducting missions as part of the conflict in Yemen. This joint resolution shall not affect any military operations directed at Al Qaeda.

The President must submit to Congress, within 90 days, reports assessing the risks that would be posed: (1) if the United States were to cease supporting operations with respect to the conflict in Yemen, and (2) if Saudi Arabia were to cease sharing Yemen-related intelligence with the United States.