Text: S.J.Res.57 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-172 (05/21/2018)

 
[115th Congress Public Law 172]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 132 STAT. 1290]]

Public Law 115-172
115th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
  Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, 
    United States Code, of the rule submitted by Bureau of Consumer 
Financial Protection relating to ``Indirect Auto Lending and Compliance 
 with the Equal Credit Opportunity Act''. <<NOTE: May 21, 2018 -  [S.J. 
                               Res. 57]>> 

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress disapproves the 
rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating 
to ``Indirect Auto Lending and Compliance with the Equal Credit 
Opportunity Act'' (CFPB Bulletin 2013-02 (March 21, 2013), and printed 
in the Congressional Record on December 6, 2017, on pages S7888-S7889, 
along with a letter of opinion from the Government Accountability Office 
dated December 5, 2017, that the Bulletin is a rule under the 
Congressional Review Act), and such rule shall have no force or effect.

    Approved May 21, 2018.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S.J. Res. 57:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 164 (2018):
            Apr. 17, 18, considered and passed Senate.
            May 8, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>