There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for the reappointment of Barbara M. Barrett as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-199. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2018Signed by President.
07/10/2018Presented to President.
06/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H5853)
06/28/2018Committee on House Administration discharged.
05/17/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3778)
05/17/2018Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3778)
04/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-199. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2018Signed by President.
07/10/2018SenatePresented to President.
06/28/2018-12:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/28/2018-12:41pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5853)
06/28/2018-12:40pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5853)
06/28/2018-12:40pmHouseMr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
06/28/2018HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
05/21/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
05/21/2018-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/21/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/17/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3778)
05/17/2018SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3778)
04/24/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 04/24/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/24/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration04/24/2018 Referred to
05/17/2018 Discharged from
House Administration05/21/2018 Referred to
06/28/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.J.Res.60. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-199 (07/20/2018)

This joint resolution reappoints Barbara M. Barrett as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.