There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of the Treasury relating to "Returns by Exempt Organizations and Returns by Certain Non-Exempt Organizations".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 49. Record Vote Number: 260.
10/11/2018Senate Committee on Finance discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
09/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
12/12/2018-5:05pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/12/2018-4:45pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 49. Record Vote Number: 260.
12/12/2018SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S7458-7474)
12/11/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion.
12/11/2018SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/11/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 630.
10/11/2018SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
09/24/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 09/24/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/26/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/04/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/04/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/04/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/04/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 10/04/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 10/04/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/04/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/04/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/04/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/10/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/10/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/10/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/10/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 10/10/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/10/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 10/10/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/10/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 10/10/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/10/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/10/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/10/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 10/10/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 10/10/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 10/10/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 10/10/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/10/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/10/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 10/10/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/10/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 10/10/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 10/10/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/11/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 12/06/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/10/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/10/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/11/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/11/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/11/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance09/24/2018 Referred to
10/11/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.64. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/12/2018)

This joint resolution nullifies a Department of the Treasury rule (Rev. Proc. 2018-38) that modifies the requirements for information returns filed by certain tax-exempt organizations.

The Treasury rule exempts certain tax-exempt organizations that are not 501(c)(3) organizations from the requirement to report the names and addresses of their contributors on returns filed with the Internal Revenue Service (IRS). The organizations must continue to collect and keep the information to make it available to the IRS upon request.