There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate on humanitarian crises in Nigeria, Somalia, South Sudan, and Yemen.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 9/27/2017 S6191)
06/05/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
04/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date
09/26/2017Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/27/2017 S6191)
09/26/2017S.Amdt.1103 Amendment SA 1103 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2017S.Amdt.1103 Amendment SA 1103 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S6140; text: CR S6140) To recognize that charities, non-profit organizations, religious organizations, and businesses of the United States have an important role in addressing humanitarian crises.
09/26/2017The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6143)
09/26/2017Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6143-6144)
06/05/2017Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 115.
06/05/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
05/25/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
04/05/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text as introduced in Senate: CR S2368-2369)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/05/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 04/06/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/06/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/01/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/01/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/05/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/18/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/05/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Markup by
06/05/2017 Reported by

As of 12/13/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.114 - A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate on humanitarian crises in Nigeria, Somalia, South Sudan, and Yemen..


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.114. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/26/2017)

Expresses the sense of the Senate that: (1) an urgent and comprehensive international diplomatic effort is necessary to address obstacles in Nigeria, Somalia, South Sudan, and Yemen that are preventing humanitarian aid from being delivered; and (2) the contributions of U.S. charities, non-profit organizations, religious organizations, and businesses have an important role in addressing humanitarian crises.

Calls for the United States to: (1) encourage other governments to join in providing the resources necessary to address the humanitarian crises in those countries, and (2) work with international partners to support efforts to hold accountable those responsible for deliberate restrictions on humanitarian access in those countries.

Calls for parties to the conflicts in those countries to: (1) allow and facilitate passage of humanitarian relief for civilians in need, and (2) respect and protect humanitarian and medical relief personnel and objects.