There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8276-8277; text: CR S8277)
12/11/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
04/25/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
12/21/2017Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8276-8277; text: CR S8277)
12/11/2017Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 281.
12/11/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
12/05/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
04/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2533-2534)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/25/2017 Referred to
12/05/2017 Markup by
12/11/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.139. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/21/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on December 11, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Condemns the government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.

Calls on such government to immediately release the five imprisoned Baha'i leaders, the seven imprisoned Baha'i educators, and all other prisoners held solely on account of their religion

Urges the President and the Department of State to: (1) condemn the Iranian government's continued violation of human rights and demand the release of prisoners held solely on account of their religion, and (2) impose sanctions on Iranian officials and other individuals directly responsible for serious human rights abuses.