Text: S.Res.15 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/20/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 15


Expressing the sense of the Senate that the Mexico City policy should be permanently established.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

January 20, 2017

Mr. Lee (for himself, Mr. Daines, Mr. Moran, Mr. Sasse, Mr. Cornyn, Mr. Cruz, and Mr. Paul) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations


RESOLUTION

Expressing the sense of the Senate that the Mexico City policy should be permanently established.

    Whereas section 104(f) of the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 (22 U.S.C. 2151b(f)) (commonly referred to as the “Helms amendment”) states that no foreign assistance funds may be used to pay for the performance of abortion as a method of family planning or to motivate or coerce any person to practice abortions;

    Whereas section 518 of the Foreign Operations, Export Financing, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2006 (Public Law 109–102; 119 Stat. 2202) (commonly referred to as the “Siljander Amendment”) states that no foreign assistance funds may be used to lobby for or against abortion;

    Whereas, in 1984, President Ronald Reagan established the “Mexico City Policy,” which prohibits foreign aid for family planning purposes from being given to foreign nongovernmental organizations that perform abortions or actively promote abortion as a method of family planning, regardless of the source of funding;

    Whereas, upon assuming office on January 20, 1989, President George H.W. Bush continued to enforce the Mexico City Policy as established by President Reagan;

    Whereas the Mexico City Policy was reestablished on January 22, 2001, by President George W. Bush; and

    Whereas, on January 23, 2009, President Barack Obama rescinded the Mexico City Policy: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That it is the sense of the Senate that—

(1) the President should immediately reapply and consider improving the Mexico City Policy; and

(2) Congress should expeditiously consider statutory changes that permanently codify the Mexico City Policy or an improved version thereof.


Share This