There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution promoting awareness of motorcycle profiling and encouraging collaboration and communication with the motorcycle community and law enforcement officials to prevent instances of profiling.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7453)
05/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
12/11/2018Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7453)
05/04/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2776)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/04/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/16/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/20/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 07/11/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/05/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/16/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/04/2017 Referred to
12/11/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.154. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/11/2018)

Promotes increased public awareness of motorcycle profiling.

Encourages collaboration and communication with the motorcycle community and law enforcement to engage in efforts to end motorcycle profiling.

Urges state law enforcement officials to include statements condemning motorcycle profiling in written policies and training materials.