There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution reaffirming the commitment of the United States to promoting religious freedom, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/11/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/11/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2920-2921)

Cosponsors (9)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 05/24/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 06/12/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 06/12/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/19/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 07/26/2017
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/27/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/11/2017 Referred to

As of 12/13/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.162 - A resolution reaffirming the commitment of the United States to promoting religious freedom, and for other purposes..


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.162. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/11/2017)

Reaffirms the U.S. commitment to promoting religious freedom as a fundamental human right.

Calls for the President to: (1) strengthen U.S. foreign policy on behalf of individuals persecuted in foreign countries on account of religion; (2) develop an action plan on international religious freedom and integrate that plan into U.S. diplomatic, development, and national security strategies; and (3) develop a strategic plan to direct grants for implementing innovative programs in key countries to train and work with local religious leaders on the importance of pluralistic societies, rights guaranteed under international law, and reporting mechanisms available within international institutions.

Urges the State Department to: (1)  implement Frank Wolf International Religious Freedom Act provisions that direct the George P. Shultz National Foreign Affairs Training Center to conduct training on religious freedom for all Foreign Service officers and all outgoing deputy chiefs of mission and ambassadors, and  (2) develop a training curriculum for American diplomats in international religious freedom policy.

Urges: (1) the President, the State Department, and relevant agencies to develop a comprehensive response to protect victims of genocide, crimes against humanity, and war crimes and to provide humanitarian, stabilization, and recovery assistance to affected individuals from religious and ethnic groups in Iraq and Syria; (2) the President and the State Department to reestablish the Religion and Foreign Policy Working Group; and (3) the President, State Department, and U.S. Trade Representative to ensure that trade negotiations include religious freedom conditions mandated by the Bipartisan Congressional Trade Priorities and Accountability Act of 2015.