There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on the Judiciary.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/24/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Grassley. Without written report.
01/24/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/24/2017Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S452)
01/24/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Grassley. Without written report.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration01/24/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary01/24/2017 Reported original measure

No related bill information was received for S.Res.21.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.21. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (01/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on the Judiciary from March 1, 2017, through February 28, 2019.

Limits expenses of such committee to specified amounts from: (1) March 1, 2017, through September 30, 2017, (2) October 1, 2017, through September 30, 2018, and (3) October 1, 2018, through February 28, 2019.