There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution affirming the historical connection of the Jewish people to the ancient and sacred city of Jerusalem and condemning efforts at the United Nations Educational, Scientific, and Cultural Organization (UNESCO) to deny Judaism's millennia-old historical, religious, and cultural ties to Jerusalem.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/16/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
10/16/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6405)

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/24/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/24/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 10/26/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 11/16/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 11/16/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/16/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 11/27/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/30/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations10/16/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.291. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/16/2017)

Affirms the Jewish people's historical connection to Jerusalem.

Recognizes that the archaeological discoveries from the City of David, the site of ancient Jerusalem, present evidence of the millennia-old connection of Jerusalem to the Jewish people and, by extension, to Christianity.

Commends the government of Israel for protecting the freedoms of all faiths in Jerusalem and ensuring their access to holy sites.

Condemns efforts by the United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural Organization (UNESCO) to delegitimize Israel through attempts to rewrite and deny Jerusalem's history.

Encourages the United States to continue working with allies to prevent UNESCO from passing biased anti-Israel resolutions.