Text: S.Res.32 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/01/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 32


Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

February 1, 2017

Mr. Risch, from the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship, reported the following original resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration


RESOLUTION

Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.

Resolved,

SECTION 1. General authority.

In carrying out its powers, duties, and functions under the Standing Rules of the Senate, in accordance with its jurisdiction under rule XXV of the Standing Rules of the Senate, including holding hearings, reporting such hearings, and making investigations as authorized by paragraphs 1 and 8 of rule XXVI of the Standing Rules of the Senate, the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship (in this resolution referred to as the “committee”) is authorized from March 1, 2017, through February 28, 2019, in its discretion, to—

(1) make expenditures from the contingent fund of the Senate;

(2) employ personnel; and

(3) with the prior consent of the Government department or agency concerned and the Committee on Rules and Administration, use on a reimbursable or nonreimbursable basis the services of personnel of any such department or agency.

SEC. 2. Expenses.

(a) Expenses for period ending September 30, 2017.—The expenses of the committee for the period March 1, 2017, through September 30, 2017, under this resolution shall not exceed $1,520,944, of which amount—

(1) not to exceed $25,000 may be expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and

(2) not to exceed $10,000 may be expended for the training of the professional staff of the committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of that Act).

(b) Expenses for fiscal year 2018 period.—The expenses of the committee for the period October 1, 2017, through September 30, 2018, under this resolution shall not exceed $2,607,332, of which amount—

(1) not to exceed $25,000 may be expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and

(2) not to exceed $10,000 may be expended for the training of the professional staff of the committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of that Act).

(c) Expenses for period ending February 28, 2019.—The expenses of the committee for the period October 1, 2018, through February 28, 2019, under this resolution shall not exceed $1,086,388, of which amount—

(1) not to exceed $25,000 may be expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and

(2) not to exceed $10,000 may be expended for the training of the professional staff of the committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of that Act).

SEC. 3. Reporting legislation.

The committee shall report its findings, together with such recommendations for legislation as it deems advisable, to the Senate at the earliest practicable date, but not later than February 28, 2019.

SEC. 4. Expenses and agency contributions.

(a) Expenses of the committee.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Except as provided in paragraph (2), expenses of the committee under this resolution shall be paid from the contingent fund of the Senate upon vouchers approved by the chairman of the committee.

(2) VOUCHERS NOT REQUIRED.—Vouchers shall not be required for—

(A) the disbursement of salaries of employees paid at an annual rate;

(B) the payment of telecommunications provided by the Office of the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper;

(C) the payment of stationery supplies purchased through the Keeper of the Stationery;

(D) payments to the Postmaster of the Senate;

(E) the payment of metered charges on copying equipment provided by the Office of the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper;

(F) the payment of Senate Recording and Photographic Services; or

(G) the payment of franked and mass mail costs by the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper.

(b) Agency contributions.—There are authorized to be paid from the appropriations account for “Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations” of the Senate such sums as may be necessary for agency contributions related to the compensation of employees of the committee—

(1) for the period March 1, 2017, through September 30, 2017;

(2) for the period October 1, 2017, through September 30, 2018; and

(3) for the period October 1, 2018, through February 28, 2019.


Share This