There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution improving procedures for the consideration of nominations in the Senate.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/08/2018Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt with amendments. Without written report.
12/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
05/08/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 400.
05/08/2018Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt with amendments. Without written report.
04/25/2018Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
12/19/2017Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
12/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7934)

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/18/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/26/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/10/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration12/07/2017 Referred to
12/19/2017 Hearings by
04/25/2018 Markup by
05/08/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.Res.355.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.355. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (05/08/2018)

Limits Senate post-cloture consideration to: (1) eight hours for a nomination, except for the nomination of an individual to a position at level I of the Executive Schedule or to serve as a federal judge or justice appointed to hold office during good behavior; and (2) two hours for U.S. district court nominations.

Requires consideration of such nominations to be equally divided in the usual form.