There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution supporting the right of all Iranian citizens to have their voices heard.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/04/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/04/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S47)

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/04/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/04/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/04/2018
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/04/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/09/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 01/09/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/09/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/09/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/09/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/09/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/09/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/09/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/09/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/09/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 01/09/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/09/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 01/10/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 01/10/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/10/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 01/10/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/10/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 01/10/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/10/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 01/10/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/11/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/11/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/11/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/11/2018
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 01/11/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/11/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 01/17/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 01/17/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 01/17/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/17/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 01/17/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/18/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 01/22/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 01/22/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/29/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/29/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 01/29/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/05/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 02/14/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/15/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/04/2018 Referred to

As of 12/13/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.368 - A resolution supporting the right of all Iranian citizens to have their voices heard..


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.368. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/04/2018)

Supports the right of all Iranian citizens to have their voices heard.

Calls on the government of Iran to respect the rights of the people of Iran to freedoms of speech, press, religion, association, and assembly.

Condemns Iran's human rights violations.

Warns Iran against any violence or retribution targeting peaceful protestors.

Objects to acts of censorship, intimidation, and other restrictions on freedoms of speech, press, and expression.

Encourages the President, the Department of State, and the U.S. Ambassador to the United Nations (U.N.) to work to convene emergency sessions of the U.N. Security Council and the U.N. Human Rights Council to condemn Iran's ongoing human rights violations and establish a related Security Council monitoring mechanism.

Calls on Iran to cooperate with and allow visits of the U.N. Special Rapporteurs for Human Rights and the U.N. Office of the High Commissioner for Human Rights.

Urges the President and State Department to work with the international community to ensure that human rights violations are part of all multilateral or bilateral discussions with and regarding Iran.