Text: S.Res.407 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/15/2018)

 
[Congressional Bills 115th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. Res. 407 Introduced in Senate (IS)]

<DOC>






115th CONGRESS
  2d Session
S. RES. 407

 Recognizing the critical work of human rights defenders in promoting 
     human rights, the rule of law, democracy, and good governance.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           February 15, 2018

    Mr. Coons (for himself and Mr. Tillis) submitted the following 
  resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Recognizing the critical work of human rights defenders in promoting 
     human rights, the rule of law, democracy, and good governance.

Whereas the Declaration on the Right and Responsibility of Individuals, Groups 
        and Organs of Society to Promote and Protect Universally Recognized 
        Human Rights and Fundamental Freedoms (referred to in this preamble as 
        the ``Declaration on Human Rights Defenders'')--

    (1) was adopted by the United Nations General Assembly on December 9, 
1998; and

    (2) states that, ``Everyone has the right . . . to promote and to 
strive for the protection and realization of human rights and fundamental 
freedoms at the national and international levels'';

Whereas the Department of State defines ``human rights defenders'' as 
        ``individuals, working alone or in groups, who non-violently advocate 
        for the promotion and protection of universally recognized human rights 
        and fundamental freedoms'';
Whereas the Senate supports the right of human rights defenders all over the 
        world to promote the fundamental freedoms enshrined in--

    (1) the Universal Declaration of Human Rights, adopted at Paris on 
December 10, 1948; and

    (2) human rights treaties;

Whereas human rights defenders protect the rights of vulnerable individuals and 
        groups;
Whereas, according to Amnesty International, an estimated 3,500 human rights 
        defenders have been murdered since the adoption of the Declaration on 
        Human Rights Defenders;
Whereas, in certain parts of the world, the work of human rights defenders is 
        threatened through--

    (1) restrictions on--

    G    (A) the press; and

    G    (B) the freedoms of expression, assembly, and association;

    (2) smear campaigns;

    (3) arbitrary detentions;

    (4) laws restricting the funding and registration of human rights 
organizations;

    (5) physical attacks;

    (6) enforced disappearances;

    (7) impunity with respect to crimes committed against human rights 
defenders; and

    (8) abuses of--

    G    (A) antiterrorism legislation; and

    G    (B) states of emergency; and

Whereas, in the Country Reports on Human Rights Practices for 2016 of the 
        Department of State, Secretary of State Rex Tillerson noted the 
        commitment of the United States to ``the human rights guaranteed to all 
        individuals around the world'': Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the Senate--
            (1) commends human rights defenders for their critical work 
        in promoting human rights, the rule of law, democracy, and good 
        governance;
            (2) recognizes the rights of human rights defenders to the 
        freedoms of association, assembly, and expression, including 
        the rights of those individuals to collect and publish data on 
        government abuses;
            (3) condemns all threats to--
                    (A) human rights defenders; and
                    (B) the work of human rights defenders in promoting 
                universally recognized human rights;
            (4) welcomes the imposition of sanctions by the President, 
        on December 21, 2017, and under the Global Magnitsky Human 
        Rights Accountability Act (subtitle F of title XII of Public 
        Law 114-328; 22 U.S.C. 2656 note), with respect to human rights 
        abusers and corrupt actors;
            (5) encourages all countries to recognize their duties 
        under the Declaration on the Right and Responsibility of 
        Individuals, Groups and Organs of Society to Promote and 
        Protect Universally Recognized Human Rights and Fundamental 
        Freedoms, adopted by the United Nations General Assembly on 
        December 9, 1998, to ``protect, promote and implement all human 
        rights and fundamental freedoms''; and
            (6) calls on the President and Secretary of State to 
        maintain leadership by the United States in promoting human 
        rights.
                                 <all>