There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution commemorating the 59th anniversary of Tibet's 1959 uprising as "Tibetan Rights Day", and expressing support for the human rights and religious freedom of the Tibetan people and the Tibetan Buddhist faith community.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/25/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2442)
03/22/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/08/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
04/25/2018Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2442)
03/22/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 363.
03/22/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/20/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/08/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1583-1584)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/08/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 03/08/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/08/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/08/2018 Referred to
03/20/2018 Markup by
03/22/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.429. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (03/22/2018)

Recognizes March 10, 2018, as Tibetan Rights Day and calls on the Department of State to fully implement the provisions of the Tibetan Policy Act of 2002.