Summary: S.Res.53 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (02/07/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on Armed Services from March 1, 2017, through February 28, 2019.

Limits expenses of such committee to specified amounts from: (1) March 1, 2017, through September 30, 2017, (2) October 1, 2017, through September 30, 2018, and (3) October 1, 2018, through February 28, 2019.