Summary: S.Res.62 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/28/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees for March 1, 2017-September 30, 2017, for FY2018, and for October 1, 2018-February 28, 2019: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Armed Services; (3) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (4) Budget; (5) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (6) Energy and Natural Resources; (7) Environment and Public Works; (8) Finance; (9) Foreign Relations; (10) Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions; (11) Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs; (12) Judiciary; (13) Rules and Administration; (14) Small Business and Entrepreneurship; (15) Veterans' Affairs; (16) Special Committee on Aging; (17) Select Committee on Intelligence; and (18) Indian Affairs.

(Sec. 20) Authorizes establishment of a special reserve within funds for Inquiries and Investigations, to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.