Text: S.Res.9 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (03/15/2017)

 
[Congressional Bills 115th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. Res. 9 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]

<DOC>






115th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. RES. 9

   Honoring in praise and remembrance the extraordinary life, steady 
leadership, and remarkable, 70-year reign of King Bhumibol Adulyadej of 
                               Thailand.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            January 10, 2017

 Mr. Hatch (for himself, Mr. Roberts, Mr. Whitehouse, Mr. Cotton, Ms. 
Duckworth, Mr. Flake, Mr. Gardner, Mr. McCain, and Mr. Reed) submitted 
   the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
                           Foreign Relations

                             March 15, 2017

             Committee discharged; considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
   Honoring in praise and remembrance the extraordinary life, steady 
leadership, and remarkable, 70-year reign of King Bhumibol Adulyadej of 
                               Thailand.

Whereas His Majesty King Bhumibol Adulyadej enjoyed a special relationship with 
        the United States, having been born in Cambridge, Massachusetts, in 1927 
        while his father was completing his medical studies at Harvard 
        University;
Whereas King Bhumibol Adulyadej ascended to the throne on June 9, 1946, and 
        celebrated his 70th year as King of Thailand in 2016;
Whereas, at the time of his death, King Bhumibol Adulyadej was the longest-
        serving head of state in the world and the longest-reigning monarch in 
        the history of Thailand;
Whereas His Majesty dedicated his life to the well-being of the Thai people and 
        the sustainable development of Thailand;
Whereas His Majesty led by example and virtue with the interest of the people at 
        heart, earning His Majesty the deep reverence of the Thai people and the 
        respect of people around the world;
Whereas His Majesty reached out to the poorest and most vulnerable people of 
        Thailand, regardless of their status, ethnicity, or religion, listened 
        to their problems, and empowered them to take their lives into their own 
        hands;
Whereas, in 2006, His Majesty received the first United Nations Human 
        Development Award, recognizing him as the ``Development King'' for the 
        extraordinary contribution of His Majesty to human development;
Whereas His Majesty was recognized internationally in the areas of intellectual 
        property, innovation, and creativity, and in 2009, the World 
        Intellectual Property Organization presented His Majesty with the Global 
        Leadership Award;
Whereas His Majesty was an anchor of peace and stability for Thailand during the 
        turbulent decades of the Cold War;
Whereas His Majesty was always a trusted friend of the United States in 
        advancing a strong and enduring alliance and partnership between the 
        United States and Thailand;
Whereas His Majesty addressed a joint session of Congress on June 29, 1960, 
        during which His Majesty reaffirmed the strong friendship and goodwill 
        between the United States and Thailand;
Whereas the United States and Thailand remain strong security allies, as 
        memorialized in the Southeast Asia Collective Defense Treaty (commonly 
        known as the ``Manila Pact of 1954'') and later expanded under the 
        Thanat-Rusk Communique of 1962;
Whereas, for decades, Thailand has hosted the annual Cobra Gold military 
        exercises, the largest multilateral exercises in Asia, to improve 
        regional defense cooperation;
Whereas Thailand has allowed the Armed Forces of the United States to use the 
        Utapao Air Base to coordinate international humanitarian relief efforts;
Whereas President George W. Bush designated Thailand as a major non-NATO ally on 
        December 30, 2003;
Whereas close cooperation and mutual sacrifices in the face of common threats 
        have bound the United States and Thailand together and established a 
        firm foundation for the advancement of a mutually beneficial 
        relationship; and
Whereas, on October 13, 2016, at the age of 88, His Majesty King Bhumibol 
        Adulyadej passed away, leaving behind a lasting legacy for Thailand: 
        Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the Senate--
            (1) honors the extraordinary life, steady leadership, and 
        remarkable, 70-year reign of His Majesty King Bhumibol 
        Adulyadej of Thailand;
            (2) extends our deepest sympathies to the members of the 
        Royal Family and to the people of Thailand in their 
        bereavement;
            (3) celebrates the alliance and friendship between Thailand 
        and the United States that reflects common interests, a 183-
        year diplomatic history, and a multifaceted partnership that 
        has contributed to peace, stability, and prosperity in the 
        Asia-Pacific region;
            (4) congratulates His Majesty King Maha Vajiralongkorn on 
        his accession to the throne; and
            (5) building on the strong foundation of alliance nurtured 
        during the reign of the father of His Majesty King Maha 
        Vajiralongkorn, looks forward to deepening the bonds of 
        friendship between Thailand and the United States.
                                 <all>