There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

WOOF! Act
Welfare of Our Friends Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Animal Welfare Act to prohibit the issuance of licenses to certain individuals connected to dealers of dogs who have had licenses revoked, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 02/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 02/07/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/11/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/11/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/13/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/13/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/13/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/14/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/14/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 02/14/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/14/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/14/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/25/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/25/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 02/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 02/25/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 02/25/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/26/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/26/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/05/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/05/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 03/06/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 03/06/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/07/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/08/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/08/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/11/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/11/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/11/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/12/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 03/14/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/14/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/14/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/21/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/21/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 03/21/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/27/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/01/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 04/01/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 04/18/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/18/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/18/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/25/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 05/16/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/17/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 05/21/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/03/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 06/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 06/19/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/19/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/09/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 07/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/12/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/23/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 08/13/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/11/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 09/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/06/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture03/01/2019 Referred to

As of 09/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1002 - WOOF! Act


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.