There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Prohibiting Unauthorized Military Action in Venezuela Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the introduction of United States Armed Forces into hostilities with respect to Venezuela, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/09/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/09/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17.
03/13/2019Committee Hearings Held.
02/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/06/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/11/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/11/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4] 02/11/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/13/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 02/22/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/22/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/27/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/27/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/27/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/28/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 02/28/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/28/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/28/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 02/28/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/28/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/04/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/04/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 03/04/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/05/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/05/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 03/21/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/21/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 03/25/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 03/27/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/27/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/27/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/27/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/27/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/08/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/08/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/29/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/29/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/29/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/01/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/09/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/16/2019
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/12/2019 03/14/2019 H2732

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/06/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/06/2019 Referred to
03/13/2019 Hearings by
04/09/2019 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1004. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2019)

Prohibiting Unauthorized Military Action in Venezuela Act

This bill prohibits funds made available to federal departments or agencies from being used to introduce the Armed Forces of the United States into hostilities with Venezuela, except pursuant to (1) a declaration of war, (2) a specific statutory authorization that meets the requirements of the War Powers Resolution and is enacted after the enactment of this bill, or (3) a national emergency created by attack upon the United States or the Armed Forces.