Text: H.R.1010 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (05/10/2019)

Union Calendar No. 29

116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1010

[Report No. 116–43, Parts I and II]


To provide that the rule entitled “Short-Term, Limited Duration Insurance” shall have no force or effect.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

February 6, 2019

Ms. Castor of Florida (for herself, Ms. Barragán, Mr. Horsford, Ms. Moore, Ms. Underwood, and Mr. DeSaulnier) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned

April 29, 2019

Reported from the Committee on Education and Labor

May 10, 2019

Additional sponsors: Mr. Welch, Ms. Schakowsky, Mr. Kennedy, Mr. Ruiz, Mrs. Dingell, Mr. Rush, Mr. Pallone, Ms. Matsui, Ms. Eshoo, Ms. Clarke of New York, Ms. Shalala, Mr. Van Drew, Ms. Wild, Ms. McCollum, Mr. Carbajal, Mr. Case, Mr. Grijalva, Mr. Moulton, Mr. Kilmer, Ms. Mucarsel-Powell, and Mr. Langevin

May 10, 2019

Reported from the Committee on Energy and Commerce

May 10, 2019

Committee on Ways and Means discharged; committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed


A BILL

To provide that the rule entitled “Short-Term, Limited Duration Insurance” shall have no force or effect.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short-term limited duration insurance rule prohibition.

The Secretary of Health and Human Services, the Secretary of the Treasury, and the Secretary of Labor may not take any action to implement, enforce, or otherwise give effect to the rule entitled “Short-Term, Limited Duration Insurance” (83 Fed. Reg. 38212 (August 3, 2018)), and the Secretaries may not promulgate any substantially similar rule.


Union Calendar No. 29

116th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 1010
[Report No. 116–43, Parts I and II]

A BILL
To provide that the rule entitled “Short-Term, Limited Duration Insurance” shall have no force or effect.

May 10, 2019
Reported from the Committee on Energy and Commerce
May 10, 2019
Committee on Ways and Means discharged; committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed