There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Great Lakes Fishery Research Authorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Great Lakes Fishery Research Authorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Director of the United States Geological Survey to conduct monitoring, assessment, science, and research, in support of the binational fisheries within the Great Lakes Basin, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/08/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-274.
02/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
11/08/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 219.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-274.
09/18/2019Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
05/08/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
02/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/06/2019 Referred to
09/18/2019 Markup by
11/08/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-274
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife02/26/2019 Referred to
05/08/2019 Hearings by
09/18/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1023. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2019)

Great Lakes Fishery Research Authorization Act of 2019

This bill authorizes the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS) to conduct monitoring, scientific assessments, and research in support of fisheries within the Great Lakes Basin between the United States and Canada.

The USGS shall (1) execute a comprehensive, multi-lake, freshwater fisheries science program; (2) work cooperatively with regional, state, tribal, and local governments; and (3) consult with interested groups, including academia and Canadian agencies.

The USGS may provide

  • deepwater ecosystem research,
  • fish behavior and habitat reports,
  • fish population assessments,
  • invasive species research,
  • use of biological equipment and laboratory capabilities necessary to support fishery management decisions, and
  • studies that assess impacts on Great Lakes fishery resources.