There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

UIGHUR Act of 2019
Uighur Intervention and Global Humanitarian Unified Response Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To counter the mass arbitrary detention of Turkic Muslims, including Uighurs, within the Xinjiang Uighur Autonomous Region of the People's Republic of China, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 02/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 02/14/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 02/27/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/27/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 04/04/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/04/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/09/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/12/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/29/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/07/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/22/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/22/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/22/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/30/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/30/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/05/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/11/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 09/24/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/13/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs02/06/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform02/06/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary02/06/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/22/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1025.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1025. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2019)

Uighur Intervention and Global Humanitarian Unified Response Act of 2019 or the UIGHUR Act of 2019

This bill imposes sourcing restrictions and export controls related to China's mass detention of the Uyghurs, a predominantly Muslim Turkic ethnic group in Xinjiang province.

Executive agencies shall not procure goods or services from foreign persons who in the last three years substantially facilitated or knowingly assisted such mass detention. When procuring goods or services from U.S. persons, executive agencies shall provide adverse consideration to awarding contracts to those involved with such mass detention, and assess the availability of other sources. The President may waive these restrictions for national security or national interest purposes.

The Department of Commerce shall deny applications to export to China various technologies, including those related to artificial intelligence or biometrics, unless the applicant certifies that the technology will not be knowingly used to facilitate the mass detention of Turkic Muslims.

The Department of State shall ensure that certain U.S. diplomatic facilities in China can provide services in the Uyghur language. The State Department shall establish a website for reporting harassment or surveillance of persons in the United States by Chinese representatives or agents, and procedures for sharing such reports with law enforcement agencies.

This bill directs various agencies to report on specified topics, including China's development of technologies related to mass detection and surveillance.