There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Space Resources Institute Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration to submit to Congress a report on the merits of, and options for, establishing an institute relating to space resources, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/06/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 02/25/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/05/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 08/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology02/06/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics02/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1029. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2019)

Space Resources Institute Act

This bill directs the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) to submit a report on the merits of, and options for, establishing an institute related to space resources in order to advance NASA's objectives for maintaining U.S. preeminence in space.