There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for pharmacy benefits manager standards under the Medicare prescription drug program and Medicare Advantage program to further transparency of payment methodologies to pharmacies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
02/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/07/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/05/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/18/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/27/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/28/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 04/02/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/10/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/12/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 04/18/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 05/07/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/30/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 07/24/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/26/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/18/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 11/20/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 04/28/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/07/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/07/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/07/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform02/07/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1035. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2019)

Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act

This bill establishes additional requirements for prescription drug plan sponsors (PDPs) under Medicare and Medicare Advantage, as well as health insurance carriers under the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program, relating to the methodology of payments to pharmacies and the use of pharmacy benefits managers (PBMs).

Specifically, such PDPs and carriers must disclose specified information to pharmacies regarding applicable standards for reimbursement that are based on drug costs, including the sources used to update such standards. Additionally, such PDPs and carriers may not contract with PBMs that require, or that provide an incentive for, plan enrollees to use pharmacies that have a shared ownership interest with the PBM.