There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ANTIQUITIES Act
America's Natural Treasures of Immeasurable Quality Unite, Inspire, and Together Improve the Economies of States Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the administration of certain national monuments, to establish a National Monument Enhancement Fund, and to establish certain wilderness areas in the States of New Mexico and Nevada.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/07/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/07/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/07/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/07/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 02/07/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 02/07/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/07/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 02/13/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/26/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 02/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 02/26/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/28/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/28/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/28/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/04/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/05/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/21/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/21/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/21/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/07/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.