There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Repatriate Our Patriots Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the removal from the United States of certain veterans, to expedite their naturalization, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/07/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/07/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/05/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/13/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/13/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/13/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/25/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/12/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/25/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/01/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 05/02/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/22/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/22/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/09/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 07/09/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/09/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/09/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/09/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/09/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 07/09/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/10/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/15/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/02/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/10/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 09/17/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 10/23/2019
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 07/09/2019 07/10/2019 H5336

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/07/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/22/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services02/07/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/08/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs02/07/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/01/2019 Referred to

As of 11/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1078 - Repatriate Our Patriots Act


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1078. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2019)

Repatriate Our Patriots Act

This bill protects certain veterans of the Armed Forces from removal from the United States, and provides such veterans with an expedited procedure for naturalization.

The bill applies to "special veterans," defined as persons who served in the active Armed Forces, who were (1) honorably discharged or released; (2) not convicted of various crimes, including voluntary manslaughter, murder, rape, or terrorism; and (3) not a child abuser or pedophile.

Special veterans shall not be removed from the United States, and the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall cancel any pending removal proceedings or orders against any such veterans. DHS shall establish a program to permit such veterans who were already removed from the United States to return to as an alien with permanent residence status.

Such veterans shall be entitled to all of the military benefits that they would be entitled to if they had never been removed from the United States.

Special veterans shall be naturalized upon filing an application, paying the relevant fees, and taking an oath of allegiance. DHS shall take steps to ensure such naturalization applications are pending for no longer than 90 days.