There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Peacebuilding Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a Department of Peacebuilding, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/04/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/04/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/04/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/04/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/04/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/04/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/04/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/04/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/04/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/04/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/05/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/27/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 03/27/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/16/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/16/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/03/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/24/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/16/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 07/17/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 10/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform02/08/2019 Referred to

As of 11/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1111 - Department of Peacebuilding Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1111. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/08/2019)

Department of Peacebuilding Act of 2019

This bill establishes a Department of Peacebuilding in the executive branch, dedicated to peacebuilding, peacemaking, and the study and promotion of conditions conducive to both domestic and international peace and a culture of peace.

The mission of the department includes the cultivation of peace and peacebuilding as a strategic national policy objective and development of policies that promote national and international conflict prevention, nonviolent intervention, mediation, peaceful conflict resolution, and structured conflict mediation.

The department shall collaborate with others to promote personal and community security and peace by supporting policies to

  • address personal and family violence, including suicide;
  • address crime, punishment, and rehabilitation, including by reducing prison recidivism rates;
  • reduce drug and alcohol abuse; and
  • create, through local community initiatives, peace projects that facilitate conflict resolution and healing of societal wounds.

A Federal Interagency Committee on Peace is established to coordinate the actions of the department with other federal agencies.

The Department of Defense and the Department of State must consult with the department concerning nonviolent means of conflict resolution when a conflict between the United States and any other government or entity is foreseeable, imminent, or occurring.

The department shall encourage citizens to observe and celebrate the blessings of peace and endeavor to create peace on Peace Days.