There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Enhanced Background Checks Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Enhanced Background Checks Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Enhanced Background Checks Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 44 of title 18, United States Code, to strengthen the background check procedures to be followed before a Federal firearms licensee may transfer a firearm to a person who is not such a licensee.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/28/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 198 (Roll no. 103).(text: CR H2284)
02/22/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-12.
02/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (40)

Date Chamber
03/05/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
03/04/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
02/28/2019-12:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/28/2019-12:02pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 198 (Roll no. 103). (text: CR H2284)
02/28/2019-11:53amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 194 - 232 (Roll no. 102).
02/28/2019-11:45amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
02/28/2019-11:31amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lesko motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to insert new text on cases in which the transferee is a victim of a crime of domestic violence.
02/28/2019-11:31amHouseMrs. Lesko moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H2291)
02/28/2019-11:29amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/28/2019-11:28amHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1112.
02/28/2019-11:28amHouseH.Amdt.53 On agreeing to the Van Drew amendment (A005) Agreed to by recorded vote: 234 - 193 (Roll no. 101).
02/28/2019-11:17amHouseH.Amdt.50 On agreeing to the Schneider amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 282 - 144 (Roll no. 100).
02/28/2019-10:46amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Van Drew amendment No. 5, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Collins (GA) demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
02/28/2019-10:38amHouseDEABTE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Van Drew amendment No. 5.
02/28/2019-10:37amHouseH.Amdt.53 Amendment (A005) offered by Mr. Van Drew. (consideration: CR H2288-2289, H2290-2291; text: CR H2288)
02/28/2019-10:36amHouseH.Amdt.52 On agreeing to the Porter amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote.
02/28/2019-10:31amHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Porter amendment No. 4.
02/28/2019-10:31amHouseH.Amdt.52 Amendment (A004) offered by Ms. Porter. (consideration: CR H2287-2288; text: CR H2288)
02/28/2019-10:31amHouseH.Amdt.51 On agreeing to the Levin (MI) amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote.
02/28/2019-10:26amHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Levin (MI) amendment No. 3.
02/28/2019-10:25amHouseH.Amdt.51 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Levin (MI). (consideration: CR H2287; text: CR H2287)
02/28/2019-10:25amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Schneider amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Nadler demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
02/28/2019-10:19amHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Schneider amendment No. 2.
02/28/2019-10:19amHouseH.Amdt.50 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Schneider. (consideration: CR H2285-2287, H2289-2290; text: CR H2285)
02/28/2019-10:18amHouseH.Amdt.49 By unanimous consent, the Rice (SC) amendment was withdrawn. (consideration: CR H2285)
02/28/2019-10:13amHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rice (SC) amendment No. 1.
02/28/2019-10:13amHouseH.Amdt.49 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Rice (SC). (consideration: CR H2284-2285; text: CR H2285)
02/28/2019-9:15amHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1112.
02/28/2019-9:15amHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Lauren Underwood to act as Chairwoman of the Committee.
02/28/2019-9:15amHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 145 and Rule XVIII.
02/28/2019-9:14amHouseProvides for one hour of debate on each measure. Only those amendments printed in the report shall be in order and the previous question shall be considered ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
02/28/2019-9:14amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 145. (consideration: CR H2277-2293)
02/26/2019-3:11pmHouseRule H. Res. 145 passed House.
02/25/2019-7:44pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 145 Reported to House. Provides for one hour of debate on each measure. Only those amendments printed in the report shall be in order and the previous question shall be considered ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
02/22/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 4.
02/22/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-12.
02/13/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
02/13/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/08/2019 Referred to
02/13/2019 Markup by
02/22/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-12

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1112. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/08/2019)

Enhanced Background Checks Act of 2019

This bill revises background check requirements applicable to proposed firearm transfers from a federal firearms licensee (e.g., a licensed gun dealer) to an unlicensed person.