There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Marijuana Revenue and Regulation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the taxation and regulation of marijuana products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
03/22/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/17/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/29/2019

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means02/08/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary02/08/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/22/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/08/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/08/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/12/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture02/08/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry02/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1120. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/08/2019)

Marijuana Revenue and Regulation Act

This bill removes marijuana from the list of controlled substances and establishes requirements for the taxation and regulation of marijuana products.

The bill imposes (1) an excise tax on marijuana products produced in or imported into the United States, and (2) an occupational tax on marijuana production facilities and export warehouses.

The term "marijuana product" does not include (1) any article containing marijuana that has been approved by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) for sale for therapeutic purposes and is marketed and sold solely for such purpose, or (2) industrial hemp.

The excise tax includes exemptions for (1) products used for research or by government entities for nonconsumption purposes; and (2) the transfer of products between production, import, and export facilities.

The Department of Justice must remove marijuana from all schedules of controlled substances under the Controlled Substances Act. The bill prohibits marijuana from being shipped or transported into any state or jurisdiction where it is illegal.

Producers, importers, and exporters of marijuana products must (1) obtain a permit from the Department of the Treasury, and (2) comply with certain requirements regarding recordkeeping, packaging, labeling, and advertising.

The bill also

  • establishes penalties for violations of marijuana laws;
  • prohibits the sale of more than one ounce of marijuana in any single retail transaction; and
  • provides specified authorities to the FDA and the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives with respect to marijuana.